Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 1083 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 31733 Week
» 130378 Month
» 333042 Year
» 3359895 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
445 |
m/e |
07/1894 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
12238 |
y/e |
1924 |
British Railways |
52238 |
w/e |
14/08/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
11 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
18 |
Works Number |
309 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 07/1894 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 14/07/1951 |
Service Life |
57 yrs , 14 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
07/1894 |
24A |
|
Accrington |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
24C |
|
Lostock Hall |
w/e |
29/01/1949 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
14/07/1951 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
24C |
Lostock Hall |
w/e |
29/01/1949 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
14/07/1951 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1894 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 445 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 309 |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 12238 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Accrington (24A) |
|
|
14/08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 52238 |
|
|
29/01/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lostock Hall (24C) |
|
|
14/07/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 52238 |
|
|