Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1810 Today
» 5610 Yesterday
» 28989 Week
» 20045 Month
» 366469 Year
» 3393322 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
16491 |
m/e |
12/1926 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1934) |
7408 |
y/e |
1934 |
British Railways |
47408 |
m/e |
10/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
3F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
35 |
Works Number |
3979 |
To Service |
During 12/1926 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 20/11/1965 |
Service Life |
38 yrs, 11 mths , 21 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1966 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
26A |
Newton Heath |
5w/e |
06/07/1963 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
20/11/1965 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1926 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 16491 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 3979 |
|
|
1934 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7408 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Carlisle Upperby (12B) |
|
|
10/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47408 |
|
|
22/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
20/11/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47408 |
|
|
02/1966 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|