Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 901 Today
» 5000 Yesterday
» 26935 Week
» 125580 Month
» 328244 Year
» 3355097 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
16681 |
m/e |
11/1928 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1934) |
7598 |
y/e |
1934 |
British Railways |
47598 |
m/e |
09/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
3F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
W.G. Bagnall |
Order Number |
59 |
Works Number |
2349 |
To Service |
During 11/1928 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 23/07/1966 |
Service Life |
37 yrs, 8 mths , 22 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1967 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1928 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 16681 Built at W.G. Bagnall, Works Number 2349 |
|
|
1934 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7598 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stafford (5C) |
|
|
09/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47598 |
|
|
07/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
17/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
01/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Alsager (5E) |
|
|
29/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Alsager (5E) |
|
|
23/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke (5D) |
|
|
24/11/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stafford (5C) |
|
|
24/08/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
28/12/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stafford (5C) |
|
|
18/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G) |
|
|
22/05/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B) |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A) |
|
|
23/07/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47598 |
|
|
10/1967 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|