Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 1962 Today
» 4203 Yesterday
» 23381 Week
» 46352 Month
» 392776 Year
» 3419629 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
1231 |
m/e |
01/1903 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9147 |
m/e |
08/1928 |
British Railways |
49147 |
m/e |
05/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Webb |
Class |
4 Cylinder Compound |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
4312 |
To Service |
During 01/1903 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 22/09/1962 |
Service Life |
59 yrs, 8 mths , 22 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
01/1903 |
10D |
|
Plodder Lane |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
10C |
|
Patricroft |
4w/e |
09/10/1954 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
22/09/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
10C |
Patricroft |
4w/e |
30/10/1954 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
22/09/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1903 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1231 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4312 |
|
|
08/1928 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9147 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Plodder Lane (10D) |
|
|
05/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49147 |
|
|
09/10/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Patricroft (10C) |
|
|
22/09/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49147 |
|
|