Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 2779 Today
» 5000 Yesterday
» 28813 Week
» 127458 Month
» 330122 Year
» 3356975 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9599 |
on |
21/12/1929 |
British Railways |
49599 |
on |
Not applied |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
7F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
Sun 21/12/1929 |
Withdrawal |
During 08/1949 |
Service Life |
19 yrs, 7 mths , 10 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1949 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
21/12/1929 |
26B |
|
Agecroft |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
08/1949 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
26B |
Agecroft |
w/e |
11/10/1947 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
13/08/1949 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
21/12/1929 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 9599 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Agecroft (26B) |
|
|
1949 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 49599 but not taken up |
|
|
1949 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
08/1949 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 9599 |
|
|