Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 1470 Today
» 5521 Yesterday
» 1470 Week
» 136286 Month
» 338950 Year
» 3365803 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D4149 |
15/10/1962 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08919 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
08 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheel Arrangement |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
To Service |
15/10/1962 to Burton (17B) |
Withdrawn |
30/09/2008 |
Time in Service |
45 yrs, 11 mths , 15 dys |
Cut Up |
m/e 06/2009 |
Cut At |
C F Booth (Rotherham) |
Status |
Scrapped |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
15/10/1962 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
15/10/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D4149 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to Burton (17B) |
|
|
30/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15A) |
|
|
06/09/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (2E) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08919 |
|
|
30/09/2008 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08919 |
|
|
06/2009 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|