Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 1064 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 31714 Week
» 130359 Month
» 333023 Year
» 3359876 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
4242 |
m/e |
02/1916 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Churchward |
Class |
42xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
2-8-0T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
203 |
Works Number |
2632 |
To Service |
During 02/1916 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 17/03/1964 |
Service Life |
48 yrs, 1 mth , 15 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1964 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
29/10/1961 |
Caerphilly Works (Erecting Shop) |
Erecting Shop: 1420/71, 1506, 1651/68 3702, 4242/65/79/98, 5232, 5618, 6115/45, 6684, 8464/9/86, 9420/57, 9671, 9710, 92221/9. Works Yard: 3682, 3797, 4690, 6108, 9489, 9639, 92238. |
SLS/196112 |
09/12/1962 |
Cardiff East Dock MPD |
There is no diesel locomotive whatever here and CED is now a full main line shed for the first time in its life ! This must be unique in railway history and the steam phase is expected to last two years as Canton is being demolished completely to make way for a diesel shed and main diesel depot for S. Wales. On 9th December, 1962, the following were on shed-1613, 2875/97, 3662, 3782/4, 3804/10, 4090, 4242/72/82, 5043/74/81/97, 5220/4/5/9, 5749, 6606/37/81, 6813/32/75/6, 6918/32/45/56/72/7/87/95, 7016, 7913, 8425/97, 9426/37, 9629, 92003/236/44/6. |
SLS/196302 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1916 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 4242 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2632 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Ebbw Junction (Newport) (NPT ) |
|
|
03/12/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Blazey (83E) |
|
|
24/03/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A) |
|
|
16/06/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A) |
|
|
21/05/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B) |
|
|
10/09/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) |
|
|
30/12/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (88A) |
|
|
08/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88L) |
|
|
17/03/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 4242 |
|
|
08/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|