Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 444 Today
» 5000 Yesterday
» 26478 Week
» 125123 Month
» 327787 Year
» 3354640 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (Orig) |
13006 |
on |
31/12/1926 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1934) |
2706 |
|
30/08/1935 |
British Railways |
42706 |
|
04/09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Hughes |
Class |
CRAB |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
84 |
To Service |
Sat 31/12/1926 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 30/11/1963 |
Service Life |
36 yrs, 10 mths , 30 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1963 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
24B |
Rose Grove |
w/e |
02/10/1948 |
ALLOC |
24A |
Accrington |
4w/e |
06/09/1952 |
ALLOC |
24B |
Rose Grove |
4w/e |
28/11/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
30/11/1963 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
31/12/1926 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 13006 Built at Horwich Works |
|
|
30/08/1935 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2706 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
04/09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 42706 |
|
|
02/10/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rose Grove (24B) |
|
|
06/09/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Accrington (24A) |
|
|
28/11/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rose Grove (24B) |
|
|
30/11/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42706 |
|
|
12/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|