Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 3617 Today
» 5521 Yesterday
» 3617 Week
» 138433 Month
» 341097 Year
» 3367950 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (Orig) |
13151 |
on |
21/02/1930 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1934) |
2851 |
|
31/05/1934 |
British Railways |
42851 |
|
18/09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Hughes |
Class |
CRAB |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Order Number |
341 |
To Service |
Sat 21/02/1930 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 30/05/1964 |
Service Life |
34 yrs, 3 mths , 9 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1964 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
21/02/1930 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 13151 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
31/05/1934 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2851 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bescot (3A) |
|
|
18/09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 42851 |
|
|
01/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
08/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
29/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B) |
|
|
04/10/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
16/06/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lancaster Green Ayre (11E) |
|
|
24/09/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B) |
|
|
08/10/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke (5D) |
|
|
15/10/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lancaster Green Ayre (24J) |
|
|
01/12/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
30/05/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42851 |
|
|
10/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|