Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 841 Today
» 5521 Yesterday
» 841 Week
» 135657 Month
» 338321 Year
» 3365174 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
2464 |
on |
14/10/1936 |
British Railways |
42464 |
w/e |
20/11/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
4P |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-4T |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
Sat 14/10/1936 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 14/08/1965 |
Service Life |
28 yrs , 10 mths |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
14/10/1936 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2464 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Oxenholme (11D) |
|
|
20/11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 42464 |
|
|
19/03/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke (5D) |
|
|
11/06/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oxenholme (12G) |
|
|
16/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carnforth (24L) |
|
|
14/09/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blackpool Central (10B) |
|
|
23/11/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lancaster Green Ayre (10J) |
|
|
14/03/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D) |
|
|
14/08/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42464 |
|
|
11/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|