Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1746 Today
» 5000 Yesterday
» 27780 Week
» 126425 Month
» 329089 Year
» 3355942 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
2590 |
on |
19/10/1936 |
British Railways |
42590 |
w/e |
17/04/1948 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 07/1965 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
19/10/1936 |
1C |
|
Watford |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
5D |
|
Stoke |
8w/e |
14/06/1952 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
27/02/1965 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
5D |
Stoke |
4w/e |
14/06/1952 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
27/02/1965 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
19/10/1936 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2590 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24346 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Watford (1C) |
|
|
17/04/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 42590 |
|
|
14/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke (5D) |
|
|
27/02/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42590 |
|
|
07/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|