Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 350 Today
» 5422 Yesterday
» 21384 Week
» 120029 Month
» 322693 Year
» 3349546 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
2222 |
on |
12/03/1946 |
British Railways |
42222 |
w/e |
11/06/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Fairburn |
Class |
4P |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-4T |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
Sat 12/03/1946 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 08/05/1965 |
Service Life |
19 yrs, 1 mth , 26 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/03/1946 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2222 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
22/06/1946 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shoeburyness (13D) |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Shoeburyness (13D) |
|
|
11/06/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 42222 |
|
|
07/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tilbury (33B) |
|
|
24/04/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neasden (34E) |
|
|
18/11/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16B) |
|
|
25/05/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
08/05/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42222 |
|
|
10/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|