Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 3965 Today
» 5422 Yesterday
» 24999 Week
» 123644 Month
» 326308 Year
» 3353161 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
42106 |
on |
03/10/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Fairburn |
Class |
4P |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-4T |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
Sat 03/10/1950 to Ramsgate (74B) |
Withdrawal |
Sat 08/05/1965 |
Service Life |
14 yrs, 7 mths , 5 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/10/1950 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 42106 Built at Brighton Works Allocated to Ramsgate (74B) |
|
|
05/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tunbridge Wells West (75F) |
|
|
30/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
20/07/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E) |
|
|
17/11/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tunbridge Wells West (75F) |
|
|
01/04/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A) |
|
|
22/03/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tunbridge Wells West (75F) |
|
|
05/12/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (1E) |
|
|
12/12/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
08/05/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42106 |
|
|
10/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|