|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Derby Works | 26/09/1942 | 15/10/1942 | 20 days | General | |||
Kilmarnock Works | 13/10/1944 | 26/10/1944 | 14 days | Light Service | Class of repair not clear |
||
Kilmarnock Works | 01/04/1946 | 06/04/1946 | 6 days | Light Ordinary | |||
Derby Works | 12/09/1947 | 12/09/1947 | 1 day | Unknown Regime | No details other than start date |
||
Inverurie Works | 30/04/1951 | 22/06/1951 | 54 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 03/06/1954 | 03/07/1954 | 31 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 26/08/1954 | 26/08/1954 | 1 day | Non Classified | Engine only |
||
Cowlairs Works | 31/10/1957 | 30/11/1957 | 31 days | Heavy Intermediate |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/1928 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 566 Built at Derby Works |
||
26/09/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (General) - Arr: 26/09/1942. Dep: 15/10/1942. | ||
13/10/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Kilmarnock Works (Light Service) - Arr: 13/10/1944. Dep: 26/10/1944. Work undertaken: Class of repair not clear |
||
01/04/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Kilmarnock Works (Light Ordinary) - Arr: 01/04/1946. Dep: 06/04/1946. | ||
03/05/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Inverness (32A) | ||
12/09/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Unknown Regime) - Arr: 12/09/1947. Dep: 12/09/1947. Work undertaken: No details other than start date |
||
04/10/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carstairs (28C) | ||
21/06/1949 | To Store | To Store | ||
29/01/1950 | Reinstated | Reinstated to Hurlford (30B) | ||
15/05/1950 | To Store | To Store | ||
15/11/1950 | Reinstated | Reinstated to Hurlford (67B) | ||
30/04/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 30/04/1951. Dep: 22/06/1951. | ||
06/1951 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 40566 | ||
17/09/1951 | To Store | To Store | ||
17/03/1952 | Reinstated | Reinstated to Hurlford (67B) | ||
14/11/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) | ||
12/12/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hamilton (West) (66C) | ||
08/06/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Corkerhill (67A) | ||
14/12/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hurlford (67B) | ||
03/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 03/06/1954. Dep: 03/07/1954. | ||
26/08/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 26/08/1954. Dep: 26/08/1954. Work undertaken: Engine only |
||
25/10/1954 | To Store | To Store | ||
01/05/1955 | Reinstated | Reinstated to Hurlford (67B) | ||
09/01/1956 | To Store | To Store | ||
04/06/1956 | Reinstated | Reinstated to Hurlford (67B) | ||
28/01/1957 | To Store | To Store | ||
27/05/1957 | Reinstated | Reinstated to Hurlford (67B) | ||
31/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 31/10/1957. Dep: 30/11/1957. | ||
30/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stranraer (68C) | ||
02/12/1960 | To Store | To Store | ||
13/09/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 40566 | ||
10/1962 | Scrapped | Scrapped |