Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 534 Today
» 5521 Yesterday
» 534 Week
» 135350 Month
» 338014 Year
» 3364867 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
1127 |
m/e |
12/1925 |
British Railways |
41127 |
w/e |
02/07/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
Compound |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
3840 |
To Service |
During 12/1925 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 10/08/1955 |
Service Life |
29 yrs, 8 mths , 11 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1955 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1925 |
30A |
|
Corkerhill |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
30D |
|
Ayr |
w/e |
05/06/1948 |
12H |
|
Stranraer |
w/e |
24/07/1948 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
10/08/1955 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
30D |
Ayr |
w/e |
05/06/1948 |
ALLOC |
12H |
Stranraer |
w/e |
24/07/1948 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
10/08/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1925 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 1127 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 3840 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Corkerhill (30A) |
|
|
05/06/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ayr (30D) |
|
|
24/07/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stranraer (12H) |
|
|
02/07/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 41127 |
|
|
08/1955 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
10/08/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 41127 |
|
|