Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 1675 Today
» 5610 Yesterday
» 28854 Week
» 19910 Month
» 366334 Year
» 3393187 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Midland Railway |
1665 |
y/e |
1883 |
Midland Railway (1907) |
356 |
y/e |
1907 |
British Railways |
40356 |
m/e |
10/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Johnson |
Class |
1562 |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Order Number |
430 |
To Service |
During 11/1883 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 24/08/1957 |
Service Life |
73 yrs, 9 mths , 24 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1957 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
by 1900 |
Rebuilt (no details available) |
by 1908 |
H boiler fitted |
by 1911 |
G7 Belpaire boiler fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
1883 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1665 |
|
|
1900 |
Modification |
Modification: Rebuilt (no details available) |
|
|
1907 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 356 |
|
|
1908 |
Modification |
Modification: H boiler fitted |
|
|
1911 |
Modification |
Modification: G7 Belpaire boiler fitted |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Preston (10B) |
|
|
19/06/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B) |
|
|
10/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40356 |
|
|
23/03/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
20/04/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Burton (17B) |
|
|
08/1957 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
24/08/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40356 |
|
|