Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 1967 Today
» 4203 Yesterday
» 23386 Week
» 46357 Month
» 392781 Year
» 3419634 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Midland Railway |
833 |
y/e |
1904 |
Midland Railway (1907) |
743 |
y/e |
1907 |
British Railways |
40743 |
m/e |
01/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Johnson |
Class |
2781 |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Order Number |
2601 |
To Service |
During 1904 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 05/07/1952 |
Service Life |
48 yrs, 7 mths , 5 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1952 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
15B |
Kettering |
w/e |
26/07/1947 |
EXLOAN |
17A |
Derby |
w/e |
25/10/1947 |
ALLOC |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
w/e |
25/06/1949 |
ALLOC |
15D |
Bedford |
w/e |
03/03/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
05/07/1952 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
by 1921 |
20½" Cylinders fitted |
by 1921 |
G8AS superheated Belpaire boiler fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
1904 |
To Service |
To service as Midland Railway Number 833 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
1907 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 743 |
|
|
1921 |
Modification |
Modification: 20½" Cylinders fitted |
|
|
1921 |
Modification |
Modification: G8AS superheated Belpaire boiler fitted |
|
|
30/11/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hellifield (20G) |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Derby (17A) |
|
|
01/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40743 |
|
|
25/06/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (20A) |
|
|
16/07/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (20A) |
|
|
03/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bedford (15D) |
|
|
24/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bedford (15D) |
|
|
05/07/1952 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40743 |
|
|
10/1952 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|