|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
04/06/1961 | Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) | Paint Shop: D105-8/10, 45139, 45403, 45584, 45626, 46146, 78021. Outside Paint Shop: D97, D109, 41222/66, 42286, 44910, 45397, 45694, 46127, 46246, 49395, 92020. Works Sidings: 41269, 42441/78, 42604, 44685, 44714/66, 44832, 44907, 45021, 45208/34/96, 45438, 45535/91, 45641, 46125/8, 46404, 48525, 90163, 90388, 90595, 92033/74. Erecting Shop: D114-9, 41218/42, 42226/96, 42431, 42559, 42625/64, 44682, 44715, 44875/92, 44946, 45056/70/80, 45107/9, 45222/38/42, 45310/27/42, 45415/26/37, 45510/23/55/64, 45703/17, 46117, 46222/9/32/8, 46429, 46509, 48258, 48305/35/93, 48409/36, 48549/53/6, 48760, 49447, 70004, 78061, 90251/76, 90557, 90685, 90724, 92087, 92132. Outside Erecting Shop: 42227, 44874, 45686, 45734, 46116/70. New Erecting Shop: D111-3/20-4, D222. Scrap Yard: 40002, 40658/91, 43225, 43459, 47374, 52240/60, 52464, 52526 all intact, with 40502 being cut-up. Works Shunters: 12022, 44373/4, 47592, 47648, 51441/4/6, 52093, 52312. | SLS/196107 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
18/06/1934 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5555, name: QUEBEC Built at Crewe Works |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Crewe North (5A) | ||
04/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 45555 | ||
19/06/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Camden (1B) | ||
01/10/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Willesden (1A) | ||
08/10/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) | ||
29/04/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) | ||
07/07/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Longsight (9A) | ||
17/07/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Longsight (9A) | ||
19/06/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) | ||
14/08/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bushbury (3B) | ||
07/11/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B) | ||
07/01/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) | ||
17/08/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 45555 | ||
09/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |