|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
11/05/1948 | Royal Trains | The ex L.N.E.R. Royal Train was used for the journeys of T.M. The King and Queen from Euston to Birmingham and back on 11/5. The engine was No. M5606 (1B). On 13/5 No. 6254 (1B) worked the ex L.M.S. Royal Train from Euston en route to Ballater | SLS/194807 |
04/02/1962 | Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) | Paint Shop: Closed indefinitely through £50 damage being wilfully caused to paintwork of D58 by a singularly irresponsible visitor in a party on 28/1/62. Outside Paint Shop: D62/3, 45436, 45660/99, 48555. New Erecting Shop: D4/6/7, D64, D213/7/31/4/88, D317. Erecting Shop: D50-5/65-7, D237, D8044, 42150, 42484, 42550, 42617, 44661/94, 44713, 44839, 44904, 45051/8/76/8, 45144, 45209/50, 45412, 45606/48, 45723, 46106/36/8/69, 46231/6, 46420, 48039, 48366, 48478, 48503, 49277, 70029, 78039, 90190, 90245/57/61/85, 92028/77/81/3, 92111/57. Erecting Shop Yard: 42280, 45208, 45304/5/15, 46257, 52312, 90096, 90665, 92076. Works Sidings: 41239, 42445, 44709/35/70, 44870/3/95, 45093, 45211, 45494, 45522, 45642/5/52/76, 46249/56, 46431, 47334, 47580, 47631, 48325, 48400, 48550, 48624, 48708, 78036, 90125, 92089. Scrap Road: Nil. | SLS/196203 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
13/04/1935 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5606, name: FALKLAND ISLANDS Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24164 |
||
30/11/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Derby (17A) | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Camden (1B) | ||
02/10/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Willesden (1A) | ||
05/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 45606 | ||
01/10/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) | ||
08/10/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Willesden (1A) | ||
12/07/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Camden (1B) | ||
27/12/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) | ||
03/01/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) | ||
19/06/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Camden (1B) | ||
02/01/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carnforth (24L) | ||
23/07/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Camden (1B) | ||
13/08/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carnforth (24L) | ||
27/06/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 45606 | ||
02/1965 | Scrapped | Scrapped |