Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 110 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 30760 Week
» 129405 Month
» 332069 Year
» 3358922 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
5735 |
on |
16/11/1936 |
British Railways |
45735 |
m/e |
06/1948 |
Names Carried
Date From |
Name |
16/11/1936 |
COMET |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
6P |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
Sat 16/11/1936 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 03/10/1964 |
Service Life |
27 yrs, 10 mths , 17 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
3B |
Bushbury |
w/e |
02/10/1948 |
ALLOC |
1B |
Camden |
w/e |
27/11/1948 |
ALLOC |
24K |
Preston |
3w/e |
26/09/1959 |
ALLOC |
8A |
Edge Hill |
4w/e |
24/09/1960 |
ALLOC |
1A |
Willesden |
5w/e |
04/02/1961 |
ALLOC |
16B |
Annesley |
5w/e |
12/10/1963 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
03/10/1964 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
07/02/1953 |
Edinburgh, Murrayfield |
Once again the International Rugby Match between Scotland and Wales provided Edinburgh with its biggest influx of special trains for any one event, 31 arriving between Thursday and Saturday morning from Wales, 24 at Princes Street, 7 at Waverley. On Thursday, 5 arrived at Princes Street during the day and among the locos were Nos. 45725 (19B) and 45552 (5A). The coaches included a set of Southern malachite green boat train coaches, a number of which were second class. All Thursday's locos were sent to Carstairs. Friday produced another 6 at Princes Street headed by such Jubilee's as 45686 (5A); 45627 (14B), 45703 (3B); 45735 (1B); and 45742 (9A). On Saturday 7 arrived at Waverley, 3 of which were hauled by 64B locos the rest by Stanier 5, 44711 (2A); 44759 (5A); 44774 (20A) and 44775 (20A). The 13 arrivals due at Princes Street started at 4.23 a.m. continuing till 10.16 a.m. Among the foreigners were 46166 (5A); 45654 (19B); 46138 (1B); 45670 (8A). The average number of cars per train was eleven and most trains had restaurant cars, all of which were Western Region with W.R. men who were provided with sleeping accommodation in five sleeping cars in Lothian Road Goods Yard. The return working of these trains started at 10.0 p.m. on Saturday and they continued to leave at roughly 10 minute intervals till 1.0 p.m. on Sunday, with breaks only between 2.10 a.m. till 9.5 am. and 10.10 a.m. and 11.25 a.m. The 7 from Waverley left between 11 p.m. and 2 a.m. Saturday night. Great credit is due to all concerned that only one train was over an hour in arriving; this was due to the one and only engine failure. Even greater credit is due to the organisation which successfully got every train out of Princes Street on time, on Sunday, and there is no doubt that a great victory over the buses was achieved. |
SLS/195304 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
16/11/1936 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5735, name: COMET Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Camden (1B) |
|
|
06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45735 |
|
|
02/10/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bushbury (3B) |
|
|
27/11/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Camden (1B) |
|
|
11/12/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Camden (1B) |
|
|
12/09/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Preston (24K) |
|
|
17/09/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
14/01/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
12/10/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Annesley (16B) |
|
|
03/10/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45735 |
|
|
01/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|