Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 712 Today
» 5521 Yesterday
» 712 Week
» 135528 Month
» 338192 Year
» 3365045 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
5548 |
on |
27/04/1934 |
British Railways |
45548 |
w/e |
02/04/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
Patriot |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
Sat 27/04/1934 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 09/06/1962 |
Service Life |
28 yrs, 1 mth , 13 dys |
Total Mileage |
1,243,530 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
Thu 20/09/1962 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
24L |
Carnforth |
4w/e |
28/11/1959 |
ALLOC |
6B |
Mold Junction |
4w/e |
30/01/1960 |
ALLOC |
2A |
Rugby |
5w/e |
30/04/1960 |
ALLOC |
2A |
Rugby |
4w/e |
31/12/1960 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
09/06/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/10/1959 |
Mold Junction MPD |
Unrebuilt Patriots 45501/11/46/8 now work freights. |
SLS/196003 |
31/12/1960 |
Miscellaneous |
Nuneaton (2B) now has Patriots 45533/7/8/41/8. Jinty 47385 is at Arley Colliery and 47653 at Haunchwood. |
SLS/196102 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
27/04/1934 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5548, name: LYTHAM ST. ANNES Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
02/04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45548 |
|
|
07/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carnforth (24L) |
|
|
23/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B) |
|
|
23/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
31/12/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B) |
|
|
09/06/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45548 |
|
|
20/09/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|