Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 27 Today
» 1013 Yesterday
» 27 Week
» 18079 Month
» 250999 Year
» 1916375 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Vehicle 50239 01/10/1957

Vehicle Specifics
Class as Built 101
Vehicle Type Motor Composite (with Lavatory) (MC(L))
To Service 01/10/1957
Status In Service

Allocations
Code Name Date From
   Withdrawn
SGosfo (New) w/e 01/10/1957


Formations
Date Unit Formation Notes
06/07/1973 (snapshot)   50239 (MC(L)),  59087 (TS(L)),  59094 (TBS(L)),  51505 (MC(L))
13/07/1973 (snapshot)   50239 (MC(L)),  59087 (TS(L)),  59094 (TBS(L)),  51505 (MC(L))
01/02/1981 (snapshot) 365 50239 (MC(L)),  59577 (TBuS(L)),  50245 (MC(L))

Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also

prev prev