Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 1049 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 31699 Week
» 130344 Month
» 333008 Year
» 3359861 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
5169 |
m/e |
12/1930 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
5101 |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
259 |
To Service |
During 12/1930 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 16/09/1960 |
Service Life |
29 yrs, 9 mths , 17 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1961 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1930 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 5169 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
08/02/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (NA) |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bristol Bath Road (BRD) |
|
|
02/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E) |
|
|
31/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E) |
|
|
16/09/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 5169 |
|
|
02/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|