Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 127 Today
» 5422 Yesterday
» 21161 Week
» 119806 Month
» 322470 Year
» 3349323 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5198 |
16/05/1963 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25048 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
25 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheel Arrangement |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
16/05/1963 to Toton (18A) |
Withdrawn |
20/02/1986 |
Time in Service |
22 yrs, 9 mths , 4 dys |
Cut Up |
on 30/04/1987 |
Cut At |
Vic Berry (Leicester) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 03/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
31/12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1971 |
|
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
|
|
01/1975 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
01/1975 |
|
EQ Brakes Removed |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1979 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
16/05/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
31/12/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 12/1971 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
01/1975 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve Brake |
|
|
by 12/1979 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
Modified Triple Valve Brake |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
16/05/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5198 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
08/02/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15A) |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
14/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09) |
|
|
31/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
03/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
12/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
11/08/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (SP) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25048 |
|
|
01/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
01/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Removed |
|
|
11/10/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (SP) |
|
|
12/1979 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
20/02/1986 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25048 |
|
|
30/04/1987 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester |
|
|