Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 549 Today
» 5521 Yesterday
» 549 Week
» 135365 Month
» 338029 Year
» 3364882 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5226 |
23/08/1963 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25076 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BSYP |
BR Blue bodywork, small yellow warning panel |
02/1968 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
04/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
10/1978 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
10/1978 |
|
Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
|
|
10/1978 |
|
EQ Brakes Removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
23/08/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
04/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
10/1978 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
23/08/1963 |
Power Unit VA537 |
|
|
|
23/08/1963 |
Steam Heat Boiler 21188 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
23/08/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5226 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
07/03/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (16C) |
|
|
06/06/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (2E) |
|
|
18/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
02/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, small yellow warning panel |
|
|
02/03/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
12/10/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
07/12/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
04/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25076 |
|
|
01/05/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (HA) |
|
|
10/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
10/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Removed |
|
|
10/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
12/11/1984 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25076 |
|
|
08/1986 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|