Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 620 Today
» 5521 Yesterday
» 620 Week
» 135436 Month
» 338100 Year
» 3364953 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5230 |
19/10/1963 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25080 |
01/1974 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
02/10/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
10/1971 |
|
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
|
|
01/1972 |
|
Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
|
|
01/1972 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 10/1977 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
19/10/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
02/10/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
10/1971 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
01/1972 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC, Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 10/1977 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
19/10/1963 |
Power Unit VA733 |
|
|
|
19/10/1963 |
Steam Heat Boiler 21189 |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
16/08/1964 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
19/10/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5230 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Cricklewood East (14A) |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
02/03/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
25/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
02/10/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
10/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
01/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
01/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
08/01/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
01/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25080 |
|
|
08/05/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (LA) |
|
|
10/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
02/09/1985 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25080 |
|
|
28/05/1993 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|