Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 8 Today
» 1013 Yesterday
» 8 Week
» 18060 Month
» 250980 Year
» 1916356 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Vehicle 59094 01/10/1957

Vehicle Specifics
Class as Built 168
Vehicle Type TBA (TBS(L))
To Service 01/10/1957
Withdrawn 28/09/1986 off Hull Botanic Gardens (BG)
Time in Service 28 yrs, 11 mths , 27 dys
Status Awaiting Scrapping

Allocations
Code Name Date From
SGosfo (New) w/e 01/10/1957
   Withdrawn on 28/09/1986


Formations
Date Unit Formation Notes
06/07/1973 (snapshot)   50239 (MC(L)),  59087 (TS(L)),  59094 (TBS(L)),  51505 (MC(L))
13/07/1973 (snapshot)   50239 (MC(L)),  59087 (TS(L)),  59094 (TBS(L)),  51505 (MC(L))

Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also

prev prev