|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stratford Works | 22/11/1948 | 01/12/1948 | 10 days | Light Repair | |||
Stratford Works | 18/02/1949 | 15/04/1949 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 9426 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61234 |
||
Stratford Works | 26/01/1951 | 17/03/1951 | 51 days | General | Boiler number 28535 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 07/05/1953 | 19/06/1953 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 28533 (Diagram 100A) Modified bogie springs fitted |
||
Stratford Works | 13/06/1955 | 05/08/1955 | 54 days | General | Boiler number 28553 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 19/06/1957 | 24/08/1957 | 67 days | General | Boiler number 28546 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 24/02/1958 | 28/02/1958 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/11/1959 | 12/12/1959 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 28158 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/02/1961 | 24/02/1961 | 16 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/02/1962 | 09/03/1962 | 12 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/08/1962 | 07/08/1962 | 1 day | No repairs |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
07/10/1947 | Queens Park Works | Further new Class 'Bl' 4-6-0's appeared ex Q.P. Works as follows: Nos 1234 (16/9), 1235 (18/9), 1236 (22/9), 1237 (24/9), 1238 (26/9), 1239 (2/10), and 1240 (6/10). On 7/10 Nos. 1241 an 1242 were in the Paint Shop, while complete in the Erecting Shop were Nos. 1243-1246. Further Works' Nos. checked are: Nos. 1234-1241 (26135-42/47) and 1243-1244 (26144-45/47). | SLS/194711 |
19/02/1961 | Doncaster Works (Outside Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D3063, D2385-9, E3056-61. New Erecting Shop Yard: E3062. Scrap Road: DEPT2, DEPT9, 61766, 64231, 68623, 68875, 68930/47/79, 69574. Stripping Road: D3452/85, 60010/23/92, 60118/36/40, 60529, 61950, 63943, 64878/85, 68943, 76032. Erecting Shop: D2233, D2402, D3165, D3575, D3630, D8210, 43081, 60030/1/68, 60103/10/29/39, 60521, 61138, 61254, 61313/8, 61807, 61901/13/61, 62032/50, 63926/86, 73001. Outside Erecting Shop: 60021/41, 61150, 61234, 61926, 63964, 73096. Crimpsall: 60133, 62039. Paint Shop: D318/33, D5686/7, D6708/9, D8046, 43152, 60514/34, 61096, 70054. Outside Paint Shop: 60124, 60522, 61165, 61954. Works Shunters: DEPT10 (ex-68911), DEPT11 (ex-68914), 68977. | SLS/196104 |
26/02/1962 | Doncaster Works (Works Yard) | Works Yard: 43158, 60039/67, 60153, 60517, 60905/28, 61000/58, 61234, 62014, 63942. Stripping Shop: 60108, 60500, 63932. Outside Stripping Shop: 60040, 60162, 60850/75, 62034, 63652, 70036, 73016. Erecting Shop: D3129, D3440/80/2, D5655/63, D6707/9/15, D8210, 43080, 60030/2/51, 60129/39, 60871, 61281, 63630, 63872, 63945/84, 70038, 73036. Outside Erecting Shop: D5525, D5605/43/70, 60028. Weigh House: 60026, 60119. Scrap Road: 61818, 61945/66, 64177/91, 64245. Paint Shop: D380, D2408, D5376, E3071/2, 12126, 60078, 60870, 61315, 63571. New Erecting Shop: D6700, D8027, E3073-8. Boiler Shop: E3079/80. Works Shunters: DEPT.10/1, 63858, 68928. Ex-Works: 61285. | SLS/196204 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
16/09/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1234 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26135 Allocated to Stratford (STR) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
22/11/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/11/1948. Dep: 01/12/1948. | ||
18/02/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1949. Dep: 15/04/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9426 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61234 |
||
26/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 26/01/1951. Dep: 17/03/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28535 (Diagram 100A) |
||
07/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1953. Dep: 19/06/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28533 (Diagram 100A) Modified bogie springs fitted |
||
13/06/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1955. Dep: 05/08/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28553 (Diagram 100A) |
||
19/06/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 19/06/1957. Dep: 24/08/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28546 (Diagram 100A) |
||
24/02/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/02/1958. Dep: 28/02/1958. | ||
03/05/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) | ||
18/11/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/11/1959. Dep: 12/12/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28158 (Diagram 100A) |
||
09/02/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/02/1961. Dep: 24/02/1961. | ||
26/02/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/02/1962. Dep: 09/03/1962. | ||
08/1962 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster | ||
07/08/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 07/08/1962. Dep: 07/08/1962. | ||
13/08/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61234 from Sheffield Darnall (41A) |