|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stratford Works | 07/02/1949 | 26/03/1949 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 3464 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61285 |
||
Stratford Works | 07/06/1950 | 29/07/1950 | 53 days | General | Speed indicator gear fitted Boiler number 28566 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 21/08/1951 | 14/09/1951 | 25 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 02/03/1952 | 10/04/1952 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 28262 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 30/07/1952 | 24/09/1952 | 57 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 15/12/1952 | 17/01/1953 | 34 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 11/12/1953 | 23/01/1954 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 28577 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 02/08/1955 | 16/09/1955 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 10823 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 14/06/1957 | 12/07/1957 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28200 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/04/1959 | 28/04/1959 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/10/1959 | 25/11/1959 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 28751 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/12/1960 | 17/12/1960 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/01/1962 | 24/02/1962 | 34 days | General |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/03/1948 | Queens Park Works | Further new Class 'B1' 4-6-0's have appeared ex Q.P. Works as follows.-Nos.1285 9/2. 1286 (11/2), 1287 (13/2), 1288 (16/2), 1289 (18/2), 1290 (20/2), 1291 (24/2), 1292 (25/2), 1293 (27/2), 1294 (1/3), 1295 (3/3), 1296 (5/3), 1297 (10/3), 1298 (11/3), 1299 (12/3), 1300 (15/3), 1301 (17/3), 1302 (23/3) and 1303 (26/3). No. 1287 was the last to appear lettered L.N.E.R. No. 1288 and onwards have appeared with 'British Railways' on the tender in 9' high letters and the prefix letter 'E' in front of the number both on the cab side and the buffer beam; all lettering and numbering being in plain yellow Gill Sans style. This week's (3/4) deliveries are expected to appear as 61304 onwards. Further Works Nos. checked are: Nos. 1285-93 (26186-94/47) and 1294- 1303 (26195-204/48), and up to No. 1303 all have appeared with the small cast L.N.E.R. number plates on the cab sides, dated 1947 and not pre fixed 'E.' | SLS/194805 |
19/12/1960 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop Yard) | New Erecting Shop: E3057-63, D3329, 12125, and frames for three new diesel shunters. Stripping Road: 60113, 60507/10/32, 61083, 61141/51, 73074. Scrap Road: 61771, 62666, 63950/3, 641S2,48875 68943/7, 69293, 69581. Erecting Shop: 43148, 60004/15/25/74/86, 60109, 60539, 61044, 61177, 61314, 61807, 73097, D3475/86, D8020. Erecting Shop Yard: 60058/66, 60144/5, 61266/85, 63923, D3487. Crimpsall Yard: 63944, 68911/4. Paint Shop: 60006, 60531. 61279, 61366, 61862, 62022/56, 63935, D312, D2113, D2207, D5675-7, E3056. | SLS/196102 |
28/01/1962 | Doncaster Works (Stripping Road) | New Erecting Shop: D5643, D8213, E3072-6. Stripping Road: D4055/63, 60129, 60853, 61285, 61315, 63630, 73036. Crimpsall: 60119, 63962. Outside Crimpsall: 60870, 60938, 61168, 62021/34. Scrap Road: 68900 intact, 61862, 61908 being cut up. Erecting Shop: D3482, D5525/95, D5642/57, 12126/33, 13288, 60043/61/78/83/97, 60107, 60817, 61252, 61374/5, 61899, 63571, 70003/7, 76021. Erecting Shop Yard: 60062, 60112. Boiler Park: 60014/47. Weigh House: D5547. Outside Weigh House: D3289, 61223, 63924, 68928, 70006. Paint Shop: D3336, D3487, D5371/2, D5822, E3070/1, 60087, 76046. Paint Shop Yard: Nil. Works Shunters: DEPT. 10/1. | SLS/196203 |
26/02/1962 | Doncaster Works (Ex-Works) | Works Yard: 43158, 60039/67, 60153, 60517, 60905/28, 61000/58, 61234, 62014, 63942. Stripping Shop: 60108, 60500, 63932. Outside Stripping Shop: 60040, 60162, 60850/75, 62034, 63652, 70036, 73016. Erecting Shop: D3129, D3440/80/2, D5655/63, D6707/9/15, D8210, 43080, 60030/2/51, 60129/39, 60871, 61281, 63630, 63872, 63945/84, 70038, 73036. Outside Erecting Shop: D5525, D5605/43/70, 60028. Weigh House: 60026, 60119. Scrap Road: 61818, 61945/66, 64177/91, 64245. Paint Shop: D380, D2408, D5376, E3071/2, 12126, 60078, 60870, 61315, 63571. New Erecting Shop: D6700, D8027, E3073-8. Boiler Shop: E3079/80. Works Shunters: DEPT.10/1, 63858, 68928. Ex-Works: 61285. | SLS/196204 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/02/1948 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1285 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26186 Allocated to Cambridge (CAM) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
07/02/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 07/02/1949. Dep: 26/03/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3464 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61285 |
||
07/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 07/06/1950. Dep: 29/07/1950. Work undertaken: Speed indicator gear fitted Boiler number 28566 (Diagram 100A) |
||
21/08/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/08/1951. Dep: 14/09/1951. | ||
02/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1952. Dep: 10/04/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28262 (Diagram 100A) |
||
30/07/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 30/07/1952. Dep: 24/09/1952. | ||
15/12/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 15/12/1952. Dep: 17/01/1953. | ||
11/12/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 11/12/1953. Dep: 23/01/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28577 (Diagram 100A) |
||
02/08/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 02/08/1955. Dep: 16/09/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 10823 (Diagram 100A) |
||
28/10/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
14/06/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/06/1957. Dep: 12/07/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28200 (Diagram 100A) |
||
22/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/04/1959. Dep: 28/04/1959. | ||
29/10/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/10/1959. Dep: 25/11/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28751 (Diagram 100A) |
||
12/06/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (40E) | ||
15/12/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/12/1960. Dep: 17/12/1960. | ||
22/01/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/01/1962. Dep: 24/02/1962. | ||
19/12/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61285 from Colwick (40E) | ||
02/1966 | Scrapped | Broken up by Steelbreaking and Dismantling Co.: Chesterfield |