|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 24/11/1923 | 22/03/1924 | 120 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5038 |
||
Gorton Works | 13/02/1926 | 24/04/1926 | 71 days | General | Boiler number 610 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/07/1927 | 24/09/1927 | 57 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 09/02/1929 | 30/03/1929 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 424 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/09/1930 | 08/11/1930 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 06/02/1932 | 05/03/1932 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 554 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/11/1933 | 09/12/1933 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 345 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/08/1935 | 12/10/1935 | 43 days | General | New inside cylinders fitted Boiler number 554 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/01/1937 | 27/02/1937 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 424 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/07/1938 | 20/08/1938 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 576 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/07/1940 | 27/07/1940 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3020 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/11/1940 | 28/12/1940 | 43 days | Heavy | |||
Gorton Works | 05/11/1942 | 12/12/1942 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 791 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/12/1944 | 20/01/1945 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 3003 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/03/1947 | 26/04/1947 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 81 (Diagram 13) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1921 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 38 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 3480 Diagram 13 boiler fitted |
||
14/10/1921 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
03/02/1922 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
28/07/1922 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
28/01/1923 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
24/11/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/11/1923. Dep: 22/03/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5038 |
||
13/02/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/02/1926. Dep: 24/04/1926. Work undertaken: Boiler number 610 (Diagram 13) |
||
30/07/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1927. Dep: 24/09/1927. | ||
09/02/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1929. Dep: 30/03/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 424 (Diagram 13) |
||
27/09/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/09/1930. Dep: 08/11/1930. | ||
06/02/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1932. Dep: 05/03/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 554 (Diagram 13) |
||
04/11/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/11/1933. Dep: 09/12/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 345 (Diagram 13) |
||
31/08/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/08/1935. Dep: 12/10/1935. Work undertaken: New inside cylinders fitted Boiler number 554 (Diagram 13) |
||
30/01/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/01/1937. Dep: 27/02/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 424 (Diagram 13) |
||
23/07/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/07/1938. Dep: 20/08/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 576 (Diagram 13) |
||
06/07/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/07/1940. Dep: 27/07/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3020 (Diagram 13) |
||
16/11/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 16/11/1940. Dep: 28/12/1940. | ||
05/11/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1942. Dep: 12/12/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 791 (Diagram 13) |
||
30/10/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
16/12/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/12/1944. Dep: 20/01/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3003 (Diagram 13) |
||
25/06/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
31/07/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1365 | ||
22/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1947. Dep: 26/04/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 81 (Diagram 13) |
||
1948 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 61365 but not taken up | ||
07/05/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 61702 | ||
13/06/1949 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61702 from Sheffield Darnall (SHF) |