|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Unknown Works | 1916 | 10/1916 | General | ||||
Darlington Works | 19/11/1924 | 21/02/1925 | 95 days | General | Boiler number D182 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/03/1925 | 08/04/1925 | 20 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 21/08/1928 | 15/10/1928 | 56 days | Heavy | Boiler number D796 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 18/05/1932 | 23/06/1932 | 37 days | General | Boiler number D935 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/05/1935 | 01/07/1935 | 55 days | General | Boiler number 2653 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 22/02/1937 | 31/03/1937 | 38 days | Heavy | |||
Darlington Works | 20/06/1939 | 01/08/1939 | 43 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 11/03/1942 | 15/04/1942 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 2423 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 26/09/1944 | 26/09/1944 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1912 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 823 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 50 boiler fitted |
||
1916 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Unknown Works (General) - Arr: ?/1916. Dep: ?/10/1916. | ||
07/10/1916 | Modification | Diagram 50 number D142 boiler fitted | ||
19/11/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/11/1924. Dep: 21/02/1925. Work undertaken: Boiler number D182 (Diagram 50) |
||
20/03/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/03/1925. Dep: 08/04/1925. | ||
11/08/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
01/04/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
21/08/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 21/08/1928. Dep: 15/10/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number D796 (Diagram 50) |
||
22/07/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
18/05/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1932. Dep: 23/06/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number D935 (Diagram 50) |
||
08/05/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/05/1935. Dep: 01/07/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2653 (Diagram 50) |
||
22/02/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 22/02/1937. Dep: 31/03/1937. | ||
20/06/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/06/1939. Dep: 01/08/1939. | ||
11/03/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1942. Dep: 15/04/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2423 (Diagram 50) |
||
26/09/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 26/09/1944. Dep: 26/09/1944. | ||
21/10/1944 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 823 from Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 1325 but not taken up |