|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/05/1949 | Darlington Works (scrap yard) | New Work May: Class 'A.1' Nos. 60148 an 60149. No. 60150 was ex the Paint Shop on 14/6, painted green. Locomotives awaiting Works durine May included: Nos. 812, 61069. 1407/15, 61600/61. 62709, 2726/41/56, 5109, 5675, 5784/87, 67317, 7609/19/20, 67708, 67741 (light repair), 8159, 9377, 69824/34/36, Class '8' 79184 an 90001. To scrap yard: Nos. 2377 (frames only), 3275/77, 3300/05/07/34, 65107, 5114, 5602, 65629 an 5703. Locomotives ex Works during May included: Nos. 60955, 61035. 61100 (unlined), 61199, 61224, 62397, 62745/53, 63351/95, 63440, 65040/47/89/92, 65110, 65653/55/59, 65730, 65848, 67319/31, 68061, 69106/11, Class '8' 90662/74. Nos. 60083/86 an 60127 have been noted here painted in the new blue colours with the crest on the tender. | SLS/194907 |
09/07/1961 | Darlington MPD (Ex-Works) | Waiting Works: D237, 60814, 61020, 63448, 67731/69, 78015, 90415. Ex-Works: 60872, 60928/42, 61273, 61303, 61448/64, 65801/93, 67636/90, 80099, 80100, 90465, 90710, 92147/92. | SLS/196108 |
26/08/1961 | York North MPD (50A) | At North shed 61448/64 were in steam ex-works, repainted and lined out. | SLS/196110 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/06/1923 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2377 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1186 Allocated to Gateshead (GHD) Diagram 49 boiler fitted |
||
13/02/1930 | Modification | Diagram 49 number D1206 boiler fitted | ||
31/01/1933 | Modification | Diagram 49 number D1434 boiler fitted | ||
20/03/1936 | Modification | Diagram 49 number D1634 boiler fitted | ||
15/01/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
28/09/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
26/10/1938 | Modification | Diagram 49 number 2887 boiler fitted | ||
11/07/1941 | Modification | Diagram 49 number 2263 boiler fitted | ||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
29/07/1944 | Modification | Diagram 49A number 3495 boiler fitted | ||
06/07/1946 | Modification | Diagram 49A number 3433 boiler fitted | ||
15/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1448 | ||
09/10/1948 | Modification | Diagram 49A number 3498 boiler fitted | ||
09/10/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 61448 | ||
18/07/1951 | Modification | Diagram 49A number 24018 boiler fitted | ||
10/10/1953 | Modification | Diagram 49A number 24009 boiler fitted | ||
12/01/1956 | Modification | Diagram 49A number 24002 boiler fitted | ||
03/05/1958 | Modification | Diagram 49A number 24071 boiler fitted | ||
30/06/1961 | Modification | Diagram 49A number 24090 boiler fitted | ||
29/06/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61448 from York (North) (50A) | ||
09/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Hughes Bolckows: North Blyth |