Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1589 Today
» 5610 Yesterday
» 28768 Week
» 19824 Month
» 366248 Year
» 3393101 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
493 |
m/e |
07/1920 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9493 |
m/e |
08/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2495 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
British Railways |
62495 |
w/e |
11/12/1948 |
Names Carried
Date From |
Name |
07/1920 |
GLEN LUSS |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Reid |
Class |
Glen |
Company History |
NBR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Cowlairs Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Fittings (as built) |
Boiler | Diagram 78 (Round Top firebox) | Engine Brakes | Steam | Train Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 07/1920 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 10/04/1961 |
Service Life |
40 yrs, 9 mths , 11 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1961 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
07/1920 |
STM |
|
St Margarets |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
10/04/1961 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
TOSTORE |
|
|
4w/e |
21/03/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
10/04/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
06/1935 |
Gravity sanding fitted |
06/1935 |
Steam Brakes fitted |
06/1935 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
17/06/1961 |
Inverurie Works |
Inverurie Works scrap yard contained the following on 17th June-40574/94, 40611/22/88, 43868, 54482/8, 54505, 55198, 56246, 56376, 57232, 57324, 57552/4, 57609, 61784, 62495, 62671, 65285/95, 68459, 69136/43 and awaiting scrapping were 56240 an 65261. A number of these have not yet been withdrawn prior to 8th May! On 24th June extra arrivals were 62474/9 an 55185 whilst 54483 was on Ferryhill en route Inverurie. |
SLS/196107 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1920 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 493, name: GLEN LUSS Built at Cowlairs Works |
|
|
08/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9493 |
|
|
06/1935 |
Modification |
Modification: Gravity sanding fitted |
|
|
06/1935 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Brakes fitted |
|
|
06/1935 |
Modification |
Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2495 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - St Margarets (STM) |
|
|
11/12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62495 |
|
|
10/04/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62495 |
|
|
05/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|