Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 1431 Today
» 5000 Yesterday
» 27465 Week
» 126110 Month
» 328774 Year
» 3355627 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
26 |
m/e |
07/1910 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
3026 |
m/e |
04/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5485 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
British Railways |
65485 |
m/e |
01/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
J5 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Order Number |
262 |
Works Number |
1271 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 07/1910 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Mon 06/12/1954 |
Service Life |
44 yrs, 5 mths , 6 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
38C |
Leicester (G.C.) |
w/e |
29/09/1951 |
ALLOC |
38A |
Colwick |
4w/e |
11/09/1954 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
06/12/1954 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
17/07/1949 |
Derby Friargate MPD |
On 17/7 the following were noted at the ex G.N.R*. shed here, during the evening:-'D.2' Nos. 62172, 2173/77; 'D.3' No. 2123; 'J.5' Nos. 65484/85, 5497; 'J.6' No.4215; 'J.69' No. 8527. On this date, owing to extensive P.W. repairs on the ex L.M.S. line between Repton and Pear Tree Junction, involving a long section of single line working, certain ex L.M.S. trains from Burton to Derby were diverted via Dove Junction and Egginton over the ex G.N. line to Derby (with ex L.N.E.R. pilotmen from Egginton), passengers being conveyed from Derby (Friargate) to the ex L.M.S. station by omnibus. *The ex G.N. shed at Derby, the entrance to which is in Slack Lane (off Uttoxeter Old Road), is well worth a visit by members visiting the ex L.M.S. Works and Shed at Derby. |
SLS/194909 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1910 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 26 |
|
|
04/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3026 |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5485 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Colwick (CLK) |
|
|
01/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65485 |
|
|
29/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (38C) |
|
|
20/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (38C) |
|
|
25/09/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
06/12/1954 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65485 |
|
|