Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 3437 Today
» 5610 Yesterday
» 30616 Week
» 21672 Month
» 368096 Year
» 3394949 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
136 |
m/e |
04/1915 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9136 |
m/e |
09/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4541 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
64541 |
m/e |
07/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Reid |
Class |
J37 |
Company History |
NBR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Cowlairs Works |
To Service |
During 04/1915 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 07/07/1964 off Ayr (67C) |
Service Life |
49 yrs, 3 mths , 6 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
67C |
Ayr |
5w/e |
12/05/1962 |
ALLOC |
62B |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
5w/e |
13/07/1963 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
07/07/1964 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
24/08/1947 |
Eastfield MPD |
On 24/8 the locos. on shed ex works were 'J39' 4923/33; 'J83' 8445 and 'J69' 8623, and further locos. ex works during August that have been noted here are: 'K2' 1757; 'J37' 4541/79/84, 4604/17/21; 'J39' 4711, 4818, 4929; 'C15' 7468; 'J88' 8345; 'J83' 8473 (green); 'N15' 9136/77 an 9222. |
SLS/194710 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1915 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 136 Built at Cowlairs Works |
|
|
09/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9136 |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4541 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Eastfield (EFD) |
|
|
07/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64541 |
|
|
21/04/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ayr (67C) |
|
|
06/07/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) |
|
|
07/07/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64541 from Ayr (67C) |
|
|
11/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw |
|
|