|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 28/12/1937 | 30/12/1937 | 3 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 20/09/1939 | 21/10/1939 | 32 days | General | Boiler number BP145 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/06/1941 | 15/08/1941 | 60 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 11/07/1942 | 17/08/1942 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 2938 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 24/05/1944 | 10/06/1944 | 18 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 05/05/1945 | 02/06/1945 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 27459 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 10/07/1947 | 20/09/1947 | 73 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 15/09/1949 | 22/10/1949 | 38 days | Light Intermediate | Renumbered to BR 64928 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 07/09/1951 | 04/10/1951 | 28 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 20/08/1952 | 12/09/1952 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 27513 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 13/10/1952 | 24/10/1952 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 20/08/1954 | 19/09/1954 | 31 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Gateshead Works | 22/02/1955 | 24/02/1955 | 3 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 19/12/1956 | 09/02/1957 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 27536 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/04/1958 | 23/05/1958 | 30 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
24/08/1947 | Cowlairs Works | On 24/8 the following withdrawn locos. were in the Works yard: 'Dl' 2212, 'D29' 2415 and 'D31' 2068, the last two having been stripped; whilst those seen here newly painted were: 'D29' 2411 (green), 'J37' 4617 and 'J39' 4704. Locos. awaiting works, some of which had been stripped were: 'J39' 4711, 4817/40/49/65, 4919/22/28/42; 'K2' 1732/46/51/68/91; 'K3' 1879; 'D1' 2216; 'Dll' 2691; 'J38' 5909; 'J36' 5223/61; 'J35' 4503; 'J37' 4546/48/65/67, 4607/15; 'D31' 2059; 'D34' 2489; 'C15' 7453/65/66, 'N14' 9121; 'N15' 9191, 9214. The Erecting Shop was full and included: 'K2' 1720/34/52; 'K3' 1855; 'J39' 4912/16; 'J38' 5901/12; 'Dll' 2684/87 and 'Y9' 8120/22. | SLS/194710 |
07/09/1947 | Eastfield MPD | Nos. 4852 an 4927 (both BLA) were observed here on 7/9, awaiting shops. Further locos. ex Works that have been noted here during September are: Nos. *1734/*1782, 1855, 2476/89, *2684/*2687, 2702, 4548, 4636, 4840/49, 4916/19/23/28, 5901/8/9/12, 7453/66, 7600, 8122, 8328, 8468/80, 9133, 9214/16 an 9564, whilst those observed on 1/10 were: *1732, 2455/73, 4578, 4865, 4922 an 9160 . *Painted green. On 11/10 'J83' No. 8474 was on shed, being ex Works and painted green. This engine now has a Gresham and Craven type 'P' solid jet ejector and an old (trigger) pattern steam brake valve. 'J37' No. 4546 has L.M.S. type water gauge frames with Dewrance protectors. | SLS/194711 |
30/10/1947 | Eastfield MPD | Further locos. ex Works that have been noted here during October were: Nos. 1743/46/51/68, *1791 (green), 1879, 2432/62/73/95, 2685/91 (both green), 4526/65/67/98, 4607, 4703/04, 4852, 4926/28/42, 5345, 7461/69/97, *8474 (green), 9147/91 an 9205; whilst those observed on 2/11 were *1995 (green), 4608, 4938 an 9500 . Nos. 1701, 1996 an 1998 were observed here fitted with snow-ploughs. Nos. 2479, 4474 an 4633 have been supplying steam to the canteen here during the period approximately from 15/10 to 26/10, while No. 5308 is again in use as a stationary boiler, after having been temporarily replaced by No. 5339. | SLS/194712 |
01/10/1949 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works 29/8 to 1/10: These included Nos. 61002/76, 61132, 1278, 61741/55/75, 1776, 61787, 61885, 61924, 62413/34, 2458, 62459, 2472, 62481, 3148, 63194, 64588, 4598, 4710, 4852/70, 4928, 64944, 4950, 5900, 65907, 7466, 67498, 67626/59/61, 68322, 8343, 8451/70/78, 69192, 69201/22, 9224, ex L.M.S. 4786, 44793, 54654, 56038, ex W.D. 77039/63, 77313/24, 90774. The only classes noted ex Cowlairs so far with the crest are 'B.1', 'J.39', 'K.2', 'K.3' and W.D. 2-8-0 and 2-10-0. No former N.B. engines have been noted with the crest, but many are lined in the latest style. | SLS/194911 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
22/04/1937 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1586 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 6825 Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
19/05/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stockton (SKN) | ||
28/12/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/12/1937. Dep: 30/12/1937. | ||
10/01/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
20/09/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/09/1939. Dep: 21/10/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number BP145 (Diagram 97) |
||
17/06/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/06/1941. Dep: 15/08/1941. | ||
11/07/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/07/1942. Dep: 17/08/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2938 (Diagram 97) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
24/05/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/05/1944. Dep: 10/06/1944. | ||
05/05/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 05/05/1945. Dep: 02/06/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27459 (Diagram 97) |
||
06/06/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4928 | ||
10/07/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 10/07/1947. Dep: 20/09/1947. | ||
01/03/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
06/03/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
15/09/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 15/09/1949. Dep: 22/10/1949. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 64928 |
||
07/09/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 07/09/1951. Dep: 04/10/1951. | ||
20/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 20/08/1952. Dep: 12/09/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27513 (Diagram 97) |
||
13/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/10/1952. Dep: 24/10/1952. | ||
26/10/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Malton (50F) | ||
01/11/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Malton (50F) | ||
20/08/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 20/08/1954. Dep: 19/09/1954. | ||
22/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/02/1955. Dep: 24/02/1955. | ||
19/12/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 19/12/1956. Dep: 09/02/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27536 (Diagram 97) |
||
24/04/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/04/1958. Dep: 23/05/1958. | ||
21/07/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64928 from Malton (50F) | ||
10/1961 | Scrapped | Scrapped |