Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 2018 Today
» 3791 Yesterday
» 10962 Week
» 2018 Month
» 348442 Year
» 3375295 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
1735 |
m/e |
11/1894 |
London and North Eastern Railway |
8302 |
on |
03/02/1946 |
British Railways |
68302 |
m/e |
10/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Worsdell |
Class |
J71 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
To Service |
During 11/1894 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 30/08/1951 |
Service Life |
56 yrs, 9 mths , 30 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
11/1894 |
WHL |
|
West Hartlepool |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
30/08/1951 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
on |
30/08/1951 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
03/10/1948 |
Darlington Works |
The first new 'A.1,' No. 60130, was on trial W/E 24/9 and No. 60131 during W/E 2/10, both are nameless. Locomotives awaiting Works:-Nos. 517, 2342/71, 3344, 5027/28, 5852/83, 7300/07, 8141, E8723, 9392, 9881, 61638, 63099, 69841 and Electric 26500. Locomotives ex Works:-Nos. 60804, 60980, 62729/75, 63333/91, 65666/92, 65752, 68302/99, 68675, 68744, 69868 and 'Austerity' 77050. No. 9089 was broken up W/E 24/9. |
SLS/194811 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1894 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1735 Built at Darlington Works |
|
|
03/02/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8302 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - West Hartlepool (WHL) |
|
|
10/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68302 |
|
|
30/08/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68302 |
|
|