Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 848 Today
» 5521 Yesterday
» 848 Week
» 135664 Month
» 338328 Year
» 3365181 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
2337 |
m/e |
10/1922 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8744 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
British Railways |
68744 |
m/e |
09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell |
Class |
J72 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Armstrong Whitworth |
Works Number |
415 |
To Service |
During 10/1922 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 28/09/1961 |
Service Life |
38 yrs, 11 mths , 29 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
GHD |
Gateshead |
w/e |
09/10/1948 |
ALLOC |
51C |
West Hartlepool |
4w/e |
11/07/1959 |
ALLOC |
51A |
Darlington |
4w/e |
08/08/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
28/09/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
03/10/1948 |
Darlington Works |
The first new 'A.1,' No. 60130, was on trial W/E 24/9 and No. 60131 during W/E 2/10, both are nameless. Locomotives awaiting Works:-Nos. 517, 2342/71, 3344, 5027/28, 5852/83, 7300/07, 8141, E8723, 9392, 9881, 61638, 63099, 69841 and Electric 26500. Locomotives ex Works:-Nos. 60804, 60980, 62729/75, 63333/91, 65666/92, 65752, 68302/99, 68675, 68744, 69868 and 'Austerity' 77050. No. 9089 was broken up W/E 24/9. |
SLS/194811 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1922 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2337 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 415 |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8744 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Heaton (HTN) |
|
|
09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68744 |
|
|
09/10/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) |
|
|
11/07/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C) |
|
|
08/08/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Darlington (51A) |
|
|
28/09/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68744 |
|
|