30/04/1948 |
Darlington Works |
'L.1's' Nos. 9000-9015 are to be renumbered 67701-67716. No. 67717 (9016) is the first to come out under this number, while No. 9015 was altered to 67716. The paint dates of Nos. 9009-9012 are March, and Nos. 9013-9015 and 67717-67718 are April. The Works' Nos. are 2028-2036/48 respectively. The next order for North Road will be a batch of 'A.1' 'Pacifics.' The rumour of further 'B.1's' came about owing to Stooperdale building a batch of spare boilers for this class. Locomotives for shops or scrap during the period April 4th-May 2nd included:-Nos. 1440, E1461, 2391, 2747, 3037, 3170, 3286, 3315, 5069, 5625, 5768/88, 7306, 7649/88, 9837/52, 9917/33, 77414, 79198. The following locomotives have arrived for cutting-up:-ex G.E. Nos. 5380/83, 5400, 7120/37, 8212, ex MET Nos. 7511/12 and ex M.G.N. No. 8485. Locomotives ex shops during the same period included Nos. 5778, 9856, 60510, 60825, 61011/60/71, 61420, 62388, 63125/40, 65624/50, 65825/47/51, 67263, 67301, 67632/84, 67718, 68248/90, 68724, 69786, 69875, 69910. The following locomotives have been painted or repainted green: Nos. 61011/60/71 an 67684. No. 60510 came off Works without nameplates, but returned and has at last had these fitted-Robert the Bruce. |
SLS/194806 |
31/12/1948 |
Darlington Works |
Locomotives awaiting Works during December included:-Nos. 952, 1437, 1625/41, 2378, 2970 (the last 'C.7'), 3368, 5639, 5650 (badly damaged at Jervaulx), 5693, 5759/97, 5807, 7278, 7651, 8010/37, 8155, 8292, 9792, 9892, 60510, 62732/33, 65056, 67704/05/10/19/23, 69910/33, 'Austerity' 70877, 77414/69. Locomotives ex Works during December included:-Nos. 60918/42/70, 61432, 61601/29/30/51, 62344/65, 62728/31/54, 63352, 63423, 65033, 65856, 67283, 67342, 67636/39/87, 67701, 68016 (altered bunker), 68264/75, 68436, 68696, 68745, 69102, 69794, 69842/79/89, 'Austerity' 77329. Locomotives broken up: Nos. 2390 an 3327. The two Class 'V.2's' which have hitherto been used as main line pilots, have now been replaced by Class 'A.3' Nos. 70 an 76. |
SLS/194902 |
12/08/1957 |
Bishops Stortford |
No transfers are recorded between Stratford and this shed (30C), its allocation at present being 65535/6, 67701/11/3/21/2/3, 69676, 69713. N7 69676 replaced 67738 which went to Lowestoft. |
SLS/195709 |
30/04/1961 |
Stratford Works (Old Works Yard) |
New Erecting Shop: D204, D5041/3/72/95, D5515/6/62, D5625, D5907, D8216, D8403/8. Outside New Erecting Shop: D206, D5050/1, D5588, D5634, D5905. Old Works: 43105, 64697, 65460/2, 67716, 69646, 69730. Old Works Yard: 65465, 67701, 68538, 69713. Scrap Road: 68578, 69656, Works Shunters : DEPT32/44/5. |
SLS/196106 |
31/07/1961 |
Stratford MPD (30A) (On shed withdrawn) |
On shed withdrawn: 64652, 67701/6/8/9/36, 68899, 69679/82/700/8. |
SLS/196109 |