|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 07/12/1922 | 27/02/1923 | 83 days | General | Boiler number D241 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/05/1925 | 31/08/1925 | 113 days | General | Boiler number D142 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 21/12/1926 | 28/03/1927 | 98 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 11/07/1928 | 17/09/1928 | 69 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 22/04/1931 | 29/05/1931 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 2390 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/06/1934 | 02/08/1934 | 51 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 12/10/1938 | 26/11/1938 | 46 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 04/04/1941 | 10/05/1941 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 24198 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 30/09/1942 | 17/10/1942 | 18 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 11/08/1943 | 10/09/1943 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 2259 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 15/03/1947 | 03/05/1947 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 2385 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/05/1947 | 12/05/1947 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 16/08/1948 | 27/08/1948 | 12 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 63362 |
||
Darlington Works | 04/01/1950 | 27/01/1950 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 2392 (Diagram 50) |
||
Gateshead Works | 05/11/1951 | 06/12/1951 | 32 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 24/03/1952 | 19/04/1952 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 24219 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 28/05/1954 | 26/06/1954 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 24192 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 28/06/1954 | 29/06/1954 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 31/07/1956 | 11/08/1956 | 12 days | Light Casual | After collision |
||
Gateshead Works | 23/09/1957 | 25/10/1957 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 24258 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/11/1959 | 02/12/1959 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 09/05/1960 | 21/05/1960 | 13 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 27/02/1961 | 12/04/1961 | 45 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 22/10/1962 | 23/11/1962 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 24254 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/02/1965 | 24/02/1965 | 1 day | Weighing |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1913 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1292 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Selby (SEL) Diagram 50 boiler fitted |
||
07/12/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/12/1922. Dep: 27/02/1923. Work undertaken: Boiler number D241 (Diagram 50) |
||
27/08/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) | ||
11/05/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1925. Dep: 31/08/1925. Work undertaken: Boiler number D142 (Diagram 50) |
||
21/12/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/12/1926. Dep: 28/03/1927. | ||
24/05/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Borough Gardens (BOR) | ||
11/07/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 11/07/1928. Dep: 17/09/1928. | ||
22/04/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 22/04/1931. Dep: 29/05/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2390 (Diagram 50) |
||
13/06/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1934. Dep: 02/08/1934. | ||
12/10/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/10/1938. Dep: 26/11/1938. | ||
01/03/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK) | ||
04/04/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/04/1941. Dep: 10/05/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24198 (Diagram 50) |
||
30/09/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/09/1942. Dep: 17/10/1942. | ||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Borough Gardens (BOR) | ||
11/08/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1943. Dep: 10/09/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2259 (Diagram 50) |
||
07/04/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3362 | ||
15/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1947. Dep: 03/05/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2385 (Diagram 50) |
||
06/05/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/05/1947. Dep: 12/05/1947. | ||
05/10/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK) | ||
16/08/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/08/1948. Dep: 27/08/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63362 |
||
07/11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
13/11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
04/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/01/1950. Dep: 27/01/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2392 (Diagram 50) |
||
03/12/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (50C) | ||
31/12/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (50C) | ||
05/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/11/1951. Dep: 06/12/1951. | ||
24/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1952. Dep: 19/04/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24219 (Diagram 50A) |
||
28/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/05/1954. Dep: 26/06/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24192 (Diagram 50A) |
||
13/06/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (54B) | ||
28/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/06/1954. Dep: 29/06/1954. | ||
31/07/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 31/07/1956. Dep: 11/08/1956. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
23/09/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1957. Dep: 25/10/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24258 (Diagram 50A) |
||
08/03/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (52C) | ||
24/11/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/11/1959. Dep: 02/12/1959. | ||
09/05/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/05/1960. Dep: 21/05/1960. | ||
27/02/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/02/1961. Dep: 12/04/1961. | ||
22/10/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/10/1962. Dep: 23/11/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24254 (Diagram 50A) |
||
16/06/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F) | ||
24/02/1965 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 24/02/1965. Dep: 24/02/1965. | ||
14/11/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63362 from Blyth (North) (52F) |