Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1143 Today
» 5521 Yesterday
» 1143 Week
» 135959 Month
» 338623 Year
» 3365476 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
6723 |
m/e |
10/1930 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
57xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
W.G. Bagnall |
Order Number |
279 |
Works Number |
2404 |
To Service |
During 10/1930 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 09/02/1959 |
Service Life |
28 yrs, 4 mths , 10 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1959 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
08/07/1957 |
Diesel Traction-Western Region |
The first of the Derby-built diesels with cooling system for the L.M.M.R line is now in traffic-13352 arrived 8th July and is to be followed by seven more (d13353/4/5/6/7 and D3358/9) at Llanelly (87F). The present diesels at latter (d13258/9/60/1) are eventually to be sent to Cardiff E.D., where, following trials with 13104/88, five diesel shunters had arrived by 6th July (13362/3/4/5/6)-five 67XX being transferred to Swansea Paxton St. (6700/17/23/76/7). In all, 36 diesels are to be allocated to C.E.D. displacing the steam allocation by the year end. |
SLS/195708 |
31/05/1959 |
Swindon Works (Scrapyard) |
Scrapyard1401/23/9/37/56/7/57, 2254, 2812/23/5/30/3, 4200/26/61, 4377, 4540/53/84, 5315/55/82/6/8/90, 5566, 5703/8/33/43, 5810, 6318/22/8/31/4/54, 6409/28, 6721/3/7/43, 7738. |
SLS/195907 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1930 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 6723 Built at W.G. Bagnall, Works Number 2404 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Barry (CV.BRY) |
|
|
15/06/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) (87K) |
|
|
09/02/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 6723 |
|
|
11/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|