|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Swindon Works | 28/02/1951 | 30/03/1951 | 31 days | Heavy Intermediate | Boiler number 7613 (Diagram HC) Tender number 4061 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
104114 | |
Swindon Works | 30/12/1952 | 06/02/1953 | 39 days | Heavy Intermediate | Boiler number 7616 (Diagram HC) Tender number 4103 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
216013 | |
Swindon Works | 13/02/1953 | 02/03/1953 | 18 days | Unclassified | |||
Swindon Works | 28/09/1954 | 29/10/1954 | 32 days | Heavy Intermediate | Boiler number 7643 (Diagram HC) Tender number 4124 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
312742 | |
Swindon Works | 08/06/1956 | 23/11/1956 | 169 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 7633 (Diagram HC) Tender number 4064 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
395696 | |
Swindon Works | 01/03/1958 | 11/04/1958 | 42 days | Heavy Intermediate | Tender number 4067 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
477993 | |
Swindon Works | 27/08/1958 | 20/11/1958 | 86 days | Light Casual | Tender number 4071 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 12/04/1960 | 16/06/1960 | 66 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 7630 (Diagram HC) |
574111 | |
Swindon Works | 12/12/1962 | 27/02/1963 | 78 days | Light Intermediate | Tender number 2731 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
651138 |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/08/1949 | Swindon Works | New Work August: Nos. 7025 Sudeley Castle PDN (2/8), 7026 Tenby Castle (15/8), 7027 Thornbury Castle LA (25/8); 1503 PDN (8/8), 1504 PDN (17/8), 1505 PDN (29/8). Nos. 7025-27 are painted dark green and lined, while Nos. 1503-05 are unlined black. Contractor built: Nos. 8400 TYS, 8401 CDF, 8402 (W.G.B. 2912/49) PILL (26/8), 8450 (Y.E. Co. 2443/49) NPT (17/8). Nos. 8400-02/50 are unlined black. Condemned: Nos. 289 (original T.V. R/T boiler and curved top tanks), 1884 (closed cab), 1930 (open cab), 2902, 3182 an 3419. No. 6320 has been re-converted to coal-burning. Locomotives entering Works during August included: Nos. 1000/04/25, 1427/37, 2117 (closed cab), 2211/12/14/21/67, 2462, 2815/52/75/87, 3016/20, 3174/86, 3635/77, 3715/99, 3805/14/43, 4013/15/33/47/80, 4107/48/49/55, 4269/78, 4502/10/59/65/82/92/95, 4637/50/79/97, 4906/51/81, 5001/18/30/42/57/76/80/94/99, 5206, 5344/45/80, 5501/05/22/37/54, 5749, 5804, 5904/12/21/27/44/45/47/66, 6000/04/19, 6105/07/43/61, 6338/77, 6408/31, 6741, 6808/19/28/29/44, 6905/65, 7219/36, 7310, 7414, 7718, 7815/16, 7904, 8789, 9638 an 90712. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined include Nos. 1005/12, 4901/23/50, 5912/18 an 6920. September: A batch of new Class '2' 2-6-2T's and Class '4' 2-6-0's is to be built here. They will be similar to existing L.M.S. designs, but will have modified G.W.R. boilers. The frames have already been cut for five of the 2-6-0's. | SLS/194910 |
06/01/1962 | Oswestry Works | Under repair-2236 (89C), 7025 (89A), 78000 (89C), 92247 and W & L 823. 9017 was stored with tender 1805 of May, 1911. | SLS/196202 |
09/08/1963 | Worcester Works | 2251, 4607, 5954, 7025 an 9493. | SLS/196309 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/08/1949 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 7025, name: SUDELEY CASTLE Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Old Oak Common (PDN) Tender fitted: Hawksworth 4,000g Diagram HC boiler fitted |
||
28/02/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 28/02/1951. Dep: 30/03/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7613 (Diagram HC) Tender number 4061 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
30/12/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 30/12/1952. Dep: 06/02/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7616 (Diagram HC) Tender number 4103 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
13/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/02/1953. Dep: 02/03/1953. | ||
28/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 28/09/1954. Dep: 29/10/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7643 (Diagram HC) Tender number 4124 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
08/06/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 08/06/1956. Dep: 23/11/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7633 (Diagram HC) Tender number 4064 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
01/03/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 01/03/1958. Dep: 11/04/1958. Work undertaken: Tender number 4067 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
27/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/08/1958. Dep: 20/11/1958. Work undertaken: Tender number 4071 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
27/12/1958 | Tender | Tender fitted: Hawksworth 4,000g number 4109 | ||
20/10/1959 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2711 | ||
12/04/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 12/04/1960. Dep: 16/06/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7630 (Diagram HC) |
||
02/08/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G) | ||
06/10/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Worcester (85A) | ||
12/12/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 12/12/1962. Dep: 27/02/1963. Work undertaken: Tender number 2731 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
28/05/1963 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2710 | ||
07/09/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 7025 from Worcester (85A) | ||
11/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cohens: Morriston |