|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
28/01/1962 | Wolverhampton Stafford Road Works | 1017(89A), 1639, 1650, 3200, 3622, 3631, 3831, 4154, 4270(88A), 4555(83A), 4645, 4663, 4946(89A), 5254(87B), 5658, 5957(81F), 6125, 6137, 6326, 6976/9, 7248, 7329, 7439, 8753(81C), 9612/23/46, 82041, 92227(88A). Works Yard: 2287(89C), D3028, D3979. Waiting Works: 3708(86G), 4179(84A), 4608(81C), 6150(81F), 6972(82B), 6992(85A), 75024(84E). | SLS/196203 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/1932 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 9307 Built at Swindon Works |
||
01/01/1934 | Allocation | |||
15/06/1947 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Reading (W.R.) (RDG) | ||
16/05/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Oxley (84B) | ||
21/12/1956 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 7329 | ||
07/01/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 7329 |