Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 1036 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 31686 Week
» 130331 Month
» 332995 Year
» 3359848 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
810 |
m/e |
03/1944 |
War Dept. |
70810 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
3046 |
on |
13/04/1947 |
British Railways (1st BR) |
63046 |
on |
Not applied |
British Railways |
90046 |
m/e |
07/1949 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
03/1944 |
18B |
|
Westhouses |
w/e |
08/10/1960 |
9G |
|
Gorton |
w/e |
30/06/1962 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
23/03/1963 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 810 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25318 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 70810 |
|
|
13/04/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3046 |
|
|
1948 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 63046 but not taken up |
|
|
07/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90046 |
|
|
08/10/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Westhouses (18B) |
|
|
30/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gorton (9G) |
|
|
23/03/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90046 |
|
|
06/1963 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire |
|
|