Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 1073 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 31723 Week
» 130368 Month
» 333032 Year
» 3359885 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
851 |
m/e |
06/1944 |
War Dept. |
70851 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
British Railways |
90331 |
m/e |
04/1949 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 851 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24912 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 70851 |
|
|
04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90331 |
|
|
23/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lees (Oldham) (26E) |
|
|
15/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Patricroft (26F) |
|
|
09/02/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
30/11/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90331 |
|
|
02/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire |
|
|