|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
08/01/1961 | Crewe Works (Outside Paint Shop) | Paint Shop: D77/8, D83/5, D3921, 42179, 45063/8, 45646/95, 48755, L.N.W.R. 1054 and the usual preserved engines. Outside Paint Shop: D74/5/9, D80/2/4, 44767, 45132, 45201, 45348, 45667, 46457, 48529, 48600, 70032, 90346. Works Sidings: 40161, 44697, 44734/82, 44867, 44936, 45336, 45428, 46235, 46430, 49158/99, 49270, 49432, 70021, 84015, 92092, 92160/7. Erecting Shop: D90-6, 42476, 42580, 44869, 45037/48, 45197, 45219/40/50/77/94, 45302/44, 45411/9, 45506/78/82, 45616/38/54/75/80, 46203/9/47/50/5, 46410/36, 48054, 48120/73, 48255, 48438, 48635/68, 48898, 49281, 70033, 90137/8/57/97, 90203/33/51, 90316, 90509, 92018/33/43, 92134/55/65. Outside Erecting Shop: 42295, 45515/60, 46103/36/7, 48508, 49034, 90297, 92048. New Erecting Shop: D76, D81/6-9, D97-102. Cutting-up Shop: Nil. | SLS/196102 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1944 | To Service | To service as WD Number 7263 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25134 |
||
01/1945 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 77263 | ||
13/08/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
09/1950 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 90346 | ||
22/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
29/12/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D) | ||
14/06/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
21/06/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
17/11/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E) | ||
21/12/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Toton (16A) | ||
18/04/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (1G) | ||
25/04/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D) | ||
13/06/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aintree (8L) | ||
08/05/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Rose Grove (10F) | ||
12/06/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E) | ||
09/10/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (40E) | ||
24/10/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 90346 | ||
02/1966 | Scrapped | Broken up by Drapers: Hull |