Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 1014 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 31664 Week
» 130309 Month
» 332973 Year
» 3359826 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7328 |
m/e |
06/1943 |
War Dept. |
77328 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
British Railways |
90240 |
m/e |
05/1951 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1943 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 7328 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25198 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77328 |
|
|
05/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90240 |
|
|
14/12/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (51B) |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
23/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ardsley (56B) |
|
|
06/11/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B) |
|
|
09/01/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90240 |
|
|
06/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Drapers: Hull |
|
|