Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 1049 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 31699 Week
» 130344 Month
» 333008 Year
» 3359861 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7452 |
m/e |
12/1943 |
War Dept. |
77452 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
British Railways |
90596 |
m/e |
03/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
WD/8 |
Company History |
WD |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
2291 |
Works Number |
4968 |
To Service |
During 12/1943 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 04/04/1967 |
Service Life |
23 yrs, 4 mths , 5 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1943 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 7452 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 4968 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77452 |
|
|
03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90596 |
|
|
25/07/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) |
|
|
13/04/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dawsholm (65D) |
|
|
10/05/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
07/09/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) |
|
|
30/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A) |
|
|
04/04/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90596 |
|
|
09/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw |
|
|