Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 1049 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 31699 Week
» 130344 Month
» 333008 Year
» 3359861 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7457 |
m/e |
12/1943 |
War Dept. |
77457 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
British Railways |
90601 |
m/e |
03/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
WD/8 |
Company History |
WD |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
2291 |
Works Number |
4973 |
To Service |
During 12/1943 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sun 06/06/1965 |
Service Life |
21 yrs, 6 mths , 7 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1943 |
36C |
|
Frodingham |
4w/e |
19/02/1955 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
06/06/1965 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
MAR |
March |
on |
13/09/1947 |
ALLOC |
36A |
Doncaster |
4w/e |
29/01/1955 |
ALLOC |
36C |
Frodingham |
4w/e |
26/02/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
06/06/1965 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
14/04/1947 |
Stonor Dump |
A visit to the 'dump' at Stonor on 14/4 found only six of the original 110 2-8-0 engines remaining. These were 77076, 77337, 77425, 77457, 78682 and 79184. Of these, 77457 would appear to be the next to leave, as it had been moved up near to the S.R. line, while 78682 does not appear to have moved from the position it occupied last June. All six were dirty, rusty and appeared to be in need of repair, and three of them (77076, 77337 and 79184) had had their builders' plates taken away. The Nissen type engine shed close by the main Ramsgate-Sandwich road was occupied by W.D. 0-6-0 ST. No. 75110, which was in steam. |
SLS/194706 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1943 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 7457 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 4973 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77457 |
|
|
03/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90601 |
|
|
19/02/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) |
|
|
06/06/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90601 |
|
|
12/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cox and Danks: Wadsley Bridge |
|
|