Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 3454 Today
» 5000 Yesterday
» 29488 Week
» 128133 Month
» 330797 Year
» 3357650 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7501 |
m/e |
03/1944 |
War Dept. |
77501 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
3120 |
m/e |
02/1947 |
British Railways (1st BR) |
63120 |
w/e |
17/04/1948 |
British Railways |
90441 |
m/e |
06/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
WD/8 |
Company History |
WD |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
2292 |
Works Number |
5017 |
To Service |
During 03/1944 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 19/10/1966 |
Service Life |
22 yrs, 7 mths , 20 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
03/1944 |
62A |
|
Thornton Junction |
4w/e |
23/02/1952 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
19/10/1966 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
4w/e |
23/02/1952 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
19/10/1966 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/12/1946 |
General |
The following 2-8-0 Austerity engines were taken in to Scottish Area stock as from 28/12/46 and are now, Class O7:- Allocated: Eastfield: 77223, 77498, 77501. St. Margaret's: 70841, 78527/8, 78625/63/64, 78708/11, 79177. Thornton: 70816/30, 77033, 77360/7, 78655/68, 78702/13. Dundee: 70852, 77277, 77505, 78654, 79251. Ferryhill (Aberdeen): 77423/35/87, 78608/41. |
SLS/194704 |
17/05/1947 |
Eastfield MPD |
New 'B1' were much in evidence here, Nos. 1191/2 on 17/5, Nos. 1194/5 on 24/5, and Nos. 1193-1197 on 31/5. 'Austerity' 2-8-0 No. 77367 was noted on 17/5, not re-numbered L.N.E. No. 3019 as stated in the Journal. (Officially given by the Co. as re-numbered to 3019 on 2/2/47.-Editor). Further 'Austerity' 2-8-0 noted here during the month ended 31/5 were: Nos. 77078, 77225, 71306, 77456, 77470 and 78568; also '07' Nos. 3020, 3089, and 3120. All appeared to be awaiting shop repair. (K.M.). |
SLS/194708 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 7501 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5017 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77501 |
|
|
02/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3120 |
|
|
17/04/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 63120 |
|
|
06/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90441 |
|
|
23/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A) |
|
|
19/10/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90441 |
|
|
05/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw |
|
|